EP0032155 - IMPROVED PHOTOCOPYING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.08.1981 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NASHUA CORPORATION 44 Franklin Street Nashua, NH 03060 / US | [1981/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAVIS, Austin E. 3 Westbrook Drive Nashua, NH 03060 / US | 02 /
LUTZ, Leo O. 26 Pine Hill Road Hollis, NH 03049 / US | 03 /
CORMIER, Raymond G. 43 Lund Street Nashua, NH 03060 / US | 04 /
BURGESS, Francis P. 79 Fisher Street Westboro, MA 01581 / US | 05 /
PAUK, Henry T. 12 Cabot Drive Nashua, NH 03060 / US | 06 /
LONES, Harry E. 3 Alex Circle Nashua, NH 03060 / US | 07 /
GUIGUIZIAN, Jacques 6 Bay View Road Ipswich, MA 01938 / US | 08 /
CAGGIULA, Christopher A. 21 Forge Drive Nashua, NH 03060 / US | 09 /
ALLEN, Walter C. 6 Bay View Road Ipswich, MA 01938 / US | 10 /
COOMBS, Peter N. P.O. Box 311 Wilton, NH 03858 / US | 11 /
BRIDGES, Richard A. RFD 3, Box 388 Manchester, NH 03103 / US | 12 /
WILLIAMS, John A. 5 Mountain View Ave Nashua, NH 03060 / US | 13 /
VIELLETTE, Norman T. 189 Wheeler Road RFD 3 Nashua, NH 03060 / US | 14 /
PIAN, Charles H.C. 64 Fifer Lane Lexington, MA 02173 / US | 15 /
HUTCHINSON, Peter 19 Parrish Hill Drive Nashua, NH 03060 / US | [1981/29] | Application number, filing date | 80901569.6 | 09.07.1980 | [1981/29] | WO1980US00909 | Priority number, date | US19790055523 | 09.07.1979 Original published format: US 55523 | US19790056129 | 09.07.1979 Original published format: US 56129 | US19790056130 | 09.07.1979 Original published format: US 56130 | US19790075980 | 17.09.1979 Original published format: US 75980 | US19790076310 | 17.09.1979 Original published format: US 76310 | US19790086749 | 22.10.1979 Original published format: US 86749 | US19800115715 | 28.01.1980 Original published format: US 115715 | US19800109393 | 03.01.1980 Original published format: US 109393 | US19800162500 | 24.06.1980 Original published format: US 162500 | US19800123389 | 21.02.1980 Original published format: US 123389 | US19790056128 | 09.07.1979 Original published format: US 56128 | [1981/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8100156 | Date: | 22.01.1981 | [1981/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0032155 | Date: | 22.07.1981 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.01.1981 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1981/29] | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/00, G03G15/10, G03G15/28, G03G21/00 | [1981/29] | CPC: |
G03G15/6532 (EP);
B65H1/04 (EP);
B65H1/12 (EP);
B65H29/56 (EP);
G03G15/065 (EP);
G03G15/10 (EP);
G03G15/6502 (EP);
G03G15/706 (EP);
G03G15/751 (EP);
G03G21/0005 (EP);
G03G21/0029 (EP);
G03G9/12 (EP);
B65H2511/10 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
B65H2511/10, B65H2220/01, B65H2220/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | FR [1981/29] | Title | German: | VERBESSERTER PHOTOKOPIEAPPARAT | [1981/29] | English: | IMPROVED PHOTOCOPYING APPARATUS | [1981/29] | French: | APPAREIL DE PHOTOCOPIAGE AMELIORE | [1981/29] | File destroyed: | 19.02.1989 | Examination procedure | 08.05.1981 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [1981/42] | 08.07.1981 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1981/42] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3926429 ; | [A]US4159172 ; | [A]US4032229 ; | [A]US4056315 ; | [A]US3791729 ; | [A]US4153364 ; | [A]US3977666 ; | [AE]US4227800 ; | [A]US3994053 ; | [A]US4134669 |