EP0039354 - PRODUCTION OF CARBOXYLIC ACIDS AND THEIR ESTERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.12.1981 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEXACO DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION 2000 Westchester Avenue White Plains New York 10650 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1981/45] | For all designated states TEXACO DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION 2000 Westchester Avenue White Plains, New York 10650 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KNIFTON, John F. 10900 Catskill Trail Austin, TX 78750 / US | 02 /
VANDERPOOL, Steven H. 8513-A Fathom Circle Austin, TX 78743 / US | 03 /
ESTES, John H. Cedar Hill Road Wappingers Falls, NY 12590 / US | 04 /
BUINICKY, Ernest P. 25 Edgewood Drive Newburgh, NY 12550 / US | [1981/45] | Application number, filing date | 80902024.1 | 29.09.1980 | [1981/45] | WO1980US01276 | Priority number, date | US19790080815 | 01.10.1979 Original published format: US 80815 | [1981/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8100856 | Date: | 02.04.1981 | [1981/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0039354 | Date: | 11.11.1981 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.04.1981 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1981/45] | Classification | IPC: | C11C3/02, C11C1/00, C07C67/36, C07C5/10, C07C5/02 | [1981/45] | CPC: |
C07C51/12 (EP);
C07C67/36 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C07C51/12, C07C53/08 (EP);
C07C67/36, C07C69/14 (EP) | Designated contracting states | FR [1981/45] | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNG VON KARBONSÄUREN UND DEREN ESTERN | [1981/45] | English: | PRODUCTION OF CARBOXYLIC ACIDS AND THEIR ESTERS | [1981/45] | French: | PRODUCTION D'ACIDES CARBOXYLIQUES ET DE LEURS ESTERS | [1981/45] | File destroyed: | 19.02.1989 | Examination procedure | 02.09.1981 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [1982/07] | 02.11.1981 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1982/07] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2053233 ; | [X]US3655745 ; | [X]US3769324 |