Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU534339B | Global Dossier | 19.01.1984 | B2 | AU6397480 | 07.05.1981 | A | Priority number | Date | AU6397480 | 24.10.1980 | AU8000078 | 24.10.1980 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3068129D1 | 12.07.1984 | D1 | Priority number | Date | AUPE108879 | 26.10.1979 | AU8000078 | 24.10.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO8101109 | Global Dossier | 30.04.1981 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AUPE108879 | 26.10.1979 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0038340 | Global Dossier | 06.06.1984 | B1 | EP0038340 | 11.08.1982 | A4 | EP0038340 | 28.10.1981 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AUPE108879 | 26.10.1979 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE7763T | 15.06.1984 | T1 | Priority number | Date | AUPE108879 | 26.10.1979 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1144086 | 05.04.1983 | A | Priority number | Date | AUPE108879 | 26.10.1979 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH0260367B | 17.12.1990 | B2 | JPS56501353 | 24.09.1981 | A | Priority number | Date | AUPE108879 | 26.10.1979 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4378983 | 05.04.1983 | A | Priority number | Date | AUPE108879 | 26.10.1979 |