EP0038340 - A HOUSING FOR MOUNTING HEPA FILTERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.04.1985 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE COMMONWEALTH OF AUSTRALIA c/o Department of Housing and Construction 239-241 Bourke Street Melbourne Victoria 3000 / AU | [N/P] |
Former [1981/43] | For all designated states THE COMMONWEALTH OF AUSTRALIA c/o Department of Housing and Construction 239-241 Bourke Street Melbourne Victoria 3000 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARTIN, David Thomas 45 Ruby Street West Essendon, 3040 Vic. / AU | [1981/43] | Representative(s) | Lawrence, Malcolm Graham, et al BROOKES & MARTIN High Holborn House 52/54 High Holborn London WC1V 6SE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/43] | Lawrence, Malcolm Graham, et al BROOKES & MARTIN High Holborn House 52/54 High Holborn London WC1V 6SE / GB | ||
Former [1981/43] | Lawrence, Malcolm Graham BROOKES & MARTIN High Holborn House 52/54 High Holborn London WC1V 6SE / GB | Application number, filing date | 80902037.3 | 24.10.1980 | [1981/43] | WO1980AU00078 | Priority number, date | AU19790001088 | 26.10.1979 Original published format: AU 108879 | [1981/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8101109 | Date: | 30.04.1981 | [1981/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0038340 | Date: | 28.10.1981 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.04.1981 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1981/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0038340 | Date: | 06.06.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.08.1982 | Classification | IPC: | B01D27/08 | [1981/43] | CPC: |
B01D46/00 (EP,US);
Y10S55/09 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1981/43] | Title | German: | GEHÄUSE ZUM MONTIEREN VON HEPA-FILTERN | [1981/43] | English: | A HOUSING FOR MOUNTING HEPA FILTERS | [1981/43] | French: | ENCIENTE DE MONTAGE DE FILTRES HEPA | [1981/43] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Entry into regional phase | 03.06.1981 | National basic fee paid | 03.06.1981 | Search fee paid | 03.06.1981 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.10.1981 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.10.1981 | Examination requested [1981/52] | 27.04.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 14.06.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 18.11.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 23.02.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.03.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 31.10.1984 | [1999/52] | Cited in | International search | [X]AU842043B ; | [X]AU4623459B ; | [X]AU5782165B ; | [X]GB1532105 (JOHNSSON B); | [A]GB2015372 (FRAM CORP) | Examination | AU8420B | AU46234B | AU57821B | FR1049129 | FR2311485 |