EP0037417 - VIBRATION ISOLATION STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.04.1985 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.06.1985 [1985/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1981/41] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NETHERLY, Samuel G. P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133 / US | [1981/41] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/26] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | ||
Former [1981/41] | Baillie, Iain Cameron c/o Ladas & Parry Isartorplatz 5 D-8000 München 2 / DE | Application number, filing date | 80902144.7 | 09.09.1980 | [1981/41] | WO1980US01105 | Priority number, date | US19790083642 | 11.10.1979 Original published format: US 83642 | [1981/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8101037 | Date: | 16.04.1981 | [1981/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0037417 | Date: | 14.10.1981 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.04.1981 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1981/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0037417 | Date: | 27.06.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.08.1982 | Classification | IPC: | F16F7/00, E04B1/82, D02G3/00 | [1981/41] | CPC: |
E04B1/98 (EP,US);
E04H9/021 (EP,US);
F16F7/015 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1345 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1386 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2975 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1982/16] |
Former [1981/41] | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | VIBRATIONS-ISOLATIONSSTRUKTUR | [1981/41] | English: | VIBRATION ISOLATION STRUCTURE | [1981/41] | French: | STRUCTURE D'ISOLATION AUX VIBRATIONS | [1981/41] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Entry into regional phase | 25.05.1981 | National basic fee paid | 25.05.1981 | Search fee paid | 25.05.1981 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.10.1981 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.08.1981 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CH, LU, NL | 13.10.1981 | Examination requested [1981/51] | 19.10.1981 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 12.09.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 06.12.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.02.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 10.02.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.03.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.08.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US3330377 (REED STANLEY F); | [X]US3542618 (DEVAUGHN DONALD H); | [A]US4110499 (HARRISON GEORGE C); | [A]US3535181 (YUNAN MALAK E); | [A]US3508991 (YUNAN MALAK E); | [A]US3485711 (FISH FLOYD HAMILTON JR, et al); | [A]US1926509 (BIERTUEMPFEL ALBERT H); | [A]US2087973 (HERMANN EARNEST T); | [A]US1968456 (KLIEFOTH MAX H) | Examination | DE2433024 | FR2155301 |