EP0041070 - AN ABSORBENT AND A METHOD OF ITS MANUFACTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 30.07.1990 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states New York Patent Development Corporation Suite 28A 45 East 89th Street New York, N.Y. 10028 / US | [1984/36] |
Former [1981/49] | For all designated states GRENTHE, Bo 19 Bengtsbogatan S-774 00 Avesta / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grenthe, Bo 19 Bengtbogatan 77400 Avesta / SE | [1984/43] |
Former [1984/36] | 01 /
Grenthe, Bo 19 Bengtbogatan | ||
Former [1981/49] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Onn, Thorsten, et al AB Stockholms Patentbyra Zacco & Bruhn P.O. Box 23101 104 35 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/49] | Onn, Thorsten, et al AB Stockholms Patentbyra Zacco & Bruhn P.O. Box 23101 S-104 35 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 80902305.4 | 25.11.1980 | [1981/49] | WO1980SE00299 | Priority number, date | SE19790009748 | 26.11.1979 Original published format: SE 7909748 | [1981/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8101575 | Date: | 11.06.1981 | [1981/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0041070 | Date: | 09.12.1981 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.06.1981 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1981/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0041070 | Date: | 24.10.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/43] | Search report(s) | Classification | IPC: | C09K3/32, B01J20/24 | [1981/49] | CPC: |
B01J20/24 (EP,US);
B01J20/22 (SE);
B01J20/28023 (EP,US);
B01J20/3078 (EP,US);
B01J20/3206 (EP,US);
B01J20/3246 (EP,US);
C09K3/32 (EP,SE,US);
B01J2220/4831 (EP,US);
B01J2220/4875 (EP,US);
Y10S210/924 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1981/49] | Title | German: | ABSORPTIONSMITTEL UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG | [1981/49] | English: | AN ABSORBENT AND A METHOD OF ITS MANUFACTURE | [1981/49] | French: | ABSORBANT ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE CELUI-CI | [1981/49] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Entry into regional phase | 10.07.1981 | National basic fee paid | 10.07.1981 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.07.1981 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.07.1981 | Examination requested [1981/49] | 28.10.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 18.06.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 20.02.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.05.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 07.05.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
15.07.1985
07.08.1985
ADMISSIBLE Papyrus Kopparfors AB Box 213 S-431 23 Mölndal / SE Opponent's representative Perneborg, Henry T., et al, et al Allied Attorneys Chemical AB P.O. Box 27097 102 51 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/38] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.07.1985
07.08.1985
ADMISSIBLE Papyrus Kopparfors AB Box 213 S-431 23 Mölndal / SE Opponent's representative Perneborg, Henry T., et al, et al Allied Attorneys Chemical AB P.O. Box 27097 S-102 51 Stockholm / SE | 10.09.1985 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 21.12.1985 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 10.01.1986 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 08.03.1986 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 21.05.1986 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 31.05.1986 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1990/38] | Appeal following opposition | 02.07.1986 | Appeal received No. T0202/86 | 13.09.1986 | Statement of grounds filed | 28.02.1990 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.10.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 24.10.1984 | LI | 24.10.1984 | LU | 30.11.1984 | [1999/52] |
Former [1989/37] | CH | 24.10.1984 | |
LI | 24.10.1984 | ||
Former [1989/31] | CH | 24.10.1984 | |
LI | 24.10.1984 | ||
Former [1989/21] | CH | 24.10.1984 | |
LI | 24.10.1984 | ||
Former [1989/13] | CH | 24.10.1984 | |
LI | 24.10.1984 | ||
Former [1989/11] | CH | 24.10.1984 | |
LI | 24.10.1984 | ||
Former [1985/13] | CH | 24.10.1984 | |
LI | 24.10.1984 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3630891 (PETERSON KENNETH S, et al); | [X]DE2212605 (INT PAPER CO [US]); | [A]US3756948 (WEINBERG J); | [X]AT347362B (BORREGAARD OESTERREICH [AT]) |