EP0033831 - Substituted naphthoic acids [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.02.1985 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.04.1985 [1985/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AMERICAN CYANAMID COMPANY 1937 West Main Street P.O. Box 60 Stamford Connecticut 06904-0060 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1982/40] | For all designated states AMERICAN CYANAMID COMPANY 1937 West Main Street P.O. Box 60 Stamford Connecticut 06904-0060 / US | ||
Former [1981/33] | For all designated states American Cyanamid Company 1937 West Main Street P.O. Box 60 Stamford Connecticut 06904 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Conrow, Ransom Brown 50 Lt. Cox Drive Pearl River New York 10965 / US | 02 /
Bernstein, Seymour 26 Scott Drive New City New York 10956 / US | [1981/33] | Representative(s) | Wächtershäuser, Günter Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwälte Ottostrasse 4 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/33] | Wächtershäuser, Günter, Prof. Dr. Patentanwalt, Tal 29 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 81100073.6 | 08.01.1981 | [1981/33] | Priority number, date | US19800118006 | 04.02.1980 Original published format: US 118006 | [1981/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0033831 | Date: | 19.08.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0033831 | Date: | 23.12.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0033831 | Date: | 11.04.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.1981 | Classification | IPC: | C07C127/19, C07C103/84, A61K31/17, A61K31/195, A61K31/24 | [1981/33] | CPC: |
C07C275/42 (EP,US);
A61P43/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1981/33] | Title | German: | Substituierte Naphthoesäuren | [1981/33] | English: | Substituted naphthoic acids | [1981/33] | French: | Acides naphtoiques substitués | [1981/33] | Examination procedure | 13.04.1982 | Examination requested [1982/25] | 09.11.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.03.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 29.09.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.11.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 14.11.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.01.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | CH322815 [ ] (WANDER AG DR A [CH]); | FR2367104 [ ] (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS Ninth Collective Index, Index Guide Vol. 76 to 85, 1972-1976 Columbus, Ohio, USA * page 1145G, middle column * | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS Vol. 87, No. 8, 15 August 1977 Columbus, Ohio, USA MOROZ "Inhibition of fibrinolytic activity of plasmin by suramin (Antrypol) and trypan blue" * page 71, column 1, Abstract No. 87: 48450v * & Thromb. Res., Vol. 10, No. 4, 1977, pages 605 to 611 (Eng). |