EP0032679 - Label printing and applying apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.11.1987 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Monarch Marking Systems, Inc. P.O. Box 608 Dayton Ohio 45401 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1981/30] | For all designated states Monarch Marking Systems, Inc. P.O. Box 608 Dayton Ohio 45401 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pabodie, Robert M. 5613 Kirkstone Drive Dayton Ohio 45459 / US | 02 /
Hamisch, Paul H., Jr. 3720 Beal Road Franklin Ohio 45005 / US | [1981/30] | Representative(s) | Leinweber & Zimmermann Patentanwalts-PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Viktualienmarkt 8 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Leinweber & Zimmermann European Patent Attorneys Patentanwälte Rosental 7 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [1981/30] | Patentanwälte Leinweber & Zimmermann Rosental 7/II Aufg. D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 81100094.2 | 08.01.1981 | [1981/30] | Priority number, date | US19800110733 | 09.01.1980 Original published format: US 110733 | [1981/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0032679 | Date: | 29.07.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0032679 | Date: | 04.08.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0032679 | Date: | 04.02.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.1982 | Classification | IPC: | B65C11/02, B41K3/60 | [1981/30] | CPC: |
B41K3/60 (EP,US);
B65C11/0247 (EP,US);
B65G45/18 (EP,US);
B65C2210/0048 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1987/06] |
Former [1981/30] | DE, FR, GB, SE | Title | German: | Gerät zum Bedrucken und Anbringen von Etiketten | [1981/30] | English: | Label printing and applying apparatus | [1981/30] | French: | Dispositif d'impression et d'application d'étiquettes | [1981/30] | Examination procedure | 17.09.1981 | Examination requested [1983/24] | 08.05.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.10.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.05.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.02.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 10.07.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 10.10.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.11.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.12.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.12.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]US3364855 (BOEKELOO MERRILL E, et al); | US3902952 [ ] (PENALUNA WILLIAM A); | US4075944 [ ] (CONLEY DWAIN D); | US4113544 [ ] (SATO YO); | [X]US4131504 (FURUTU AKIRA); | [Y]FR2395918 (MONARCH MARKING SYSTEMS INC [US]); | [Y]DE2916523 (VIDAC FA); | [E]EP0027934 (ESSELTE PENDAFLEX CORP [US]) | Examination | US4125421 | US4125419 |