Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0033839 | Global Dossier | 29.05.1985 | B1 | EP0033839 | 31.03.1982 | A3 | EP0033839 | 19.08.1981 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE3004307 | 06.02.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR8100691 | 18.08.1981 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3004307 | 06.02.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3004307 | 07.06.1984 | C2 | DE3004307 | 13.08.1981 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3004307 | 06.02.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES8201479 | 16.12.1981 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3004307 | 06.02.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS6229242B | 25.06.1987 | B2 | JPS56120839 | 22.09.1981 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3004307 | 06.02.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX153064 | 24.07.1986 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3004307 | 06.02.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4368878 | 18.01.1983 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3004307 | 06.02.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4502672 | 05.03.1985 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3004307 | 06.02.1980 |