Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
05.06.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.08.1984 [1984/32] |
21.05.1983 | (Expected) grant | published on 20.07.1983 [1983/29] |
14.10.1981 | Request for examination filed | published on 16.12.1981 [1981/50] |
30.05.1981 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 29.07.1981 [1981/30] |