EP0032691 - Process for producing a superconductor with an intermetallic connection [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.06.1984 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.08.1984 [1984/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/30] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wilhelm, Manfred, Dr. Teutonenstrasse 23 D-8500 Nürnberg / DE | [1981/30] | Application number, filing date | 81100124.7 | 09.01.1981 | [1981/30] | Priority number, date | DE19803002196 | 22.01.1980 Original published format: DE 3002196 | DE19803002177 | 22.01.1980 Original published format: DE 3002177 | [1981/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0032691 | Date: | 29.07.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0032691 | Date: | 20.07.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.05.1981 | Classification | IPC: | H01L39/24 | [1981/30] | CPC: |
H10N60/0184 (EP,US);
Y10S505/815 (EP,US);
Y10S505/921 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49014 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, FR, GB, IT, LI [1981/30] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Supraleiters mit einer intermetallischen Verbindung | [1981/30] | English: | Process for producing a superconductor with an intermetallic connection | [1981/30] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un supraconducteur de composition intermétallique | [1981/30] | Examination procedure | 05.10.1981 | Examination requested [1981/50] | 25.08.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 16.11.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.12.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 16.12.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.04.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US4053976 [ ] (SCANLAN RONALD M, et al) | Examination | DE1945642 | FR2293800 |