Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] |
09.08.1983 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.10.1983 [1983/41] |
25.11.1982 | Change - representative | published on 26.01.1983 [1983/04] |
02.11.1981 | Request for examination filed | published on 06.01.1982 [1982/01] |
08.06.1981 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 05.08.1981 [1981/31] |