EP0033522 - Process for preparing calcium silicate shaped product [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.03.1984 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.05.1984 [1984/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI KASEI CORPORATION 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1981/32] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI KASEI CORPORATION 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oguri, Yasuo 56-4, Gohtokuji 1-chome Setagaya-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Awata, Mitsuru No. 568, Hanakoganei 5-chome Kodaira-shi Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Abe, Mitsunobu 5-1, Tsutsujigoaku Midori-ku, Yokohama-shi / JP | [1981/32] | Representative(s) | Wächtershäuser, Günter Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwälte Ottostrasse 4 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/32] | Wächtershäuser, Günter, Prof. Dr. Patentanwalt, Tal 29 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 81100656.8 | 29.01.1981 | [1981/32] | Priority number, date | JP19800012162 | 04.02.1980 Original published format: JP 1216280 | [1981/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0033522 | Date: | 12.08.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0033522 | Date: | 11.05.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.1981 | Classification | IPC: | C04B15/06 | [1981/32] | CPC: |
C04B28/18 (EP,US);
Y02P40/60 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C04B28/18, C04B14/06, C04B20/0048, C04B40/024, C04B40/0259 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [1981/45] |
Former [1981/32] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Herstellen eines Calcium-Silikat-Formkörpers | [1981/32] | English: | Process for preparing calcium silicate shaped product | [1981/32] | French: | Procédé de préparation d'un corps façonné de silicate de calcium | [1981/32] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 01.06.1981 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, FR, IT, LU, SE | 12.08.1981 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 29.09.1981 | Examination requested [1981/50] | 09.08.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 29.10.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 22.12.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.02.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 02.03.1981 | AT   M02   Not yet paid | 02.03.1981 | BE   M02   Not yet paid | 02.03.1981 | CH   M02   Not yet paid | 02.03.1981 | FR   M02   Not yet paid | 02.03.1981 | IT   M02   Not yet paid | 02.03.1981 | LU   M02   Not yet paid | 02.03.1981 | SE   M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | Examination | DE2751660 | US3501324 | BE809987 |