blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0035120

EP0035120 - Highly sensitive fault current protection switch responding to any current [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  08.02.1984
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2007Change - inventorpublished on 08.08.2007  [2007/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SCHUPA-ELEKTRO-GMBH + CO KG
Postfach 14 60
D-58570 Schalksmühle / DE
[1981/36]
Inventor(s)01 / Meyer, Richard
Riemerschmidstrasse 14
D-5800 Hagen / DE
[1981/36]
Application number, filing date81100676.630.01.1981
[1981/36]
Priority number, dateDE1980300722727.02.1980         Original published format: DE 3007227
[1981/36]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0035120
Date:09.09.1981
Language:DE
[1981/36]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0035120
Date:04.11.1981
Language:DE
[1981/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.09.1981
ClassificationIPC:H02H3/33, H02H3/17
[1981/36]
CPC:
H02H3/331 (EP); H02H3/332 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1981/36]
TitleGerman:Hochempfindlicher, allstromsensitiver Fehlerstromschutzschalter[1981/36]
English:Highly sensitive fault current protection switch responding to any current[1981/36]
French:Interrupteur très sensible de protection répondant à tout courant de défaut[1981/36]
File destroyed:14.07.1990
Examination procedure07.04.1982Examination requested  [1982/25]
05.05.1983Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.09.1983Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1984/15]
19.10.1983Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [1984/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.01.1983Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]DE1815180  ;
 DE2845993  [ ];
 DE2730874  [ ]
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.