EP0033921 - Built-in baking and roasting oven [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.03.1984 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bosch-Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Hochstrasse 17 81669 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/36] | For all designated states Bosch-Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Hochstrasse 17 D-81669 München / DE | ||
Former [1981/33] | For all designated states NEFF-WERKE Carl Neff GmbH Bahnhof-Strasse 9-11 D-7518 Bretten / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baschin, Horst Merianstrasse 53 D-7520 Bruchsal / DE | 02 /
Bohnet, Armin Goetheplatz 5 D-7140 Ludwigsburg / DE | [1981/33] | Representative(s) | Seemüller, Walter BOSCH-SIEMENS HAUSGERÄTE GMBH Patent- und Vertragswesen Hochstrasse 17 D-8000 München 80 / DE | [1983/04] |
Former [1981/33] | Vogl, Leo AEG Aktiengesellschaft, Patent- und Lizenzwesen, Theodor-Stern-Kai 1 D-60596 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 81100697.2 | 31.01.1981 | [1981/33] | Priority number, date | DE19803004410 | 07.02.1980 Original published format: DE 3004410 | [1981/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0033921 | Date: | 19.08.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0033921 | Date: | 18.11.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.1981 | Classification | IPC: | A47B77/04, F24C15/00 | [1981/46] | CPC: |
A47B77/04 (EP);
A47B77/12 (EP);
F24C15/00 (EP);
F24C15/027 (EP);
A47B2200/13 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1981/33] | A47B77/04 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1981/33] | Title | German: | Einbauback- und -bratofen | [1981/33] | English: | Built-in baking and roasting oven | [1981/33] | French: | Appareil de cuisson incorporé dans un meuble de cuisine | [1981/33] | File destroyed: | 14.07.1990 | Examination procedure | 30.04.1982 | Examination requested [1982/28] | 29.06.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.1983 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1984/22] | 12.12.1983 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1984/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1984 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3028209 [ ]; | US2897812 [ ]; | DE2657746 [ ]; | US3358669 [ ]; | US2882382 [ ]; | US3167065 [ ]; | US2658985 [ ] |