EP0033539 - Use of aminoantipyrine compounds and new aminoantipyrine derivatives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1981/32] | Aminoantipyrine derivatives and their use | ||
[1983/03] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH D-68298 Mannheim / DE | [1981/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Batz, Hans-Georg, Dr. Traubinger Strasse 63 D-8132 Tutzing / DE | [1981/32] | Representative(s) | Weickmann, Heinrich, et al Patentanwälte Weickmann, Fincke Weickmann, Huber, Liska Möhlstrasse 22 D-8000 München 86 / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/32] | Weickmann, Heinrich, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. H. Weickmann Dipl.-Phys.Dr. K. Fincke Dipl.-Ing. F.A. Weickmann Dipl.-Chem. B. Huber Dr.-Ing. H. Liska M hlstrasse 22 D-8000 München 86 / DE | Application number, filing date | 81100737.6 | 02.02.1981 | [1981/32] | Priority number, date | DE19803039207 | 07.10.1980 Original published format: DE 3039207 | DE19803004129 | 05.02.1980 Original published format: DE 3004129 | DE19813100807 | 13.01.1981 Original published format: DE 3100807 | [1981/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0033539 | Date: | 12.08.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0033539 | Date: | 19.01.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.05.1981 | Classification | IPC: | C07D231/46, C12Q1/28 | [1981/32] | CPC: |
C07D231/26 (EP,US);
C07D231/46 (EP,US);
C12Q1/28 (EP,US);
C12Q2326/00 (EP,US);
C12Q2326/50 (EP,US);
C12Q2326/96 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1981/32] | Title | German: | Verwendung von Aminoantipyrin-Verbindungen und neue Aminoantipyrinderivative | [1983/03] | English: | Use of aminoantipyrine compounds and new aminoantipyrine derivatives | [1983/03] | French: | Utilisation de composés de l'aminoantipyrine et nouveaux dérivés de l'aminoantipyrine | [1983/03] |
Former [1981/32] | Neue Aminoantipyrin-Verbindungen und ihre Verwendung | ||
Former [1981/32] | Aminoantipyrine derivatives and their use | ||
Former [1981/32] | Dérivés de l'aminoantipyrine et leur utilisation | Examination procedure | 10.09.1981 | Examination requested [1981/46] | 17.05.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 20.07.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 07.09.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.10.1983 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | AT150301B [ ] (IG FARBENINDUSTRIE AG); | DE92009 [ ] |