EP0037875 - Modular data processing system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1981/42] | Modular terminal system | ||
[1986/32] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.1987 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2009 | Change - representative | published on 24.06.2009 [2009/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Nixdorf Informationssysteme Aktiengesellschaft Fürstenallee 7 D-4790 Paderborn / DE | [1984/31] |
Former [1981/42] | For all designated states NIXDORF COMPUTER AG Pontanusstrasse 55 D-4790 Paderborn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stokken, Richard Anthony 29 Paulette Lane Attleboro Massachusettes 02703 / US | [1981/42] | Representative(s) | Schaumburg und Partner Patentanwälte mbB Mauerkircherstraße 31 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | Schaumburg, Thoenes, Thurn, Landskron, Eckert Patentanwälte Postfach 86 07 48 81634 München / DE | ||
Former [1981/42] | Schaumburg, Thoenes & Thurn Mauerkircherstrasse 31 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 81100768.1 | 04.02.1981 | [1981/42] | Priority number, date | US19800138957 | 10.04.1980 Original published format: US 138957 | [1981/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0037875 | Date: | 21.10.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0037875 | Date: | 06.08.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.1981 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/16, G06F13/00, G06F9/44, G06F12/06, G06F13/42 | [1986/32] | CPC: |
G06F12/0623 (EP,US);
G06F12/063 (EP,US);
G06F13/26 (EP,US);
G06F13/37 (EP,US);
G06F13/4217 (EP,US);
G06F15/17 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1981/42] | G06F15/16, G06F3/04, G06F13/00, G06F9/44 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [1981/42] | Title | German: | Modulares Datenverarbeitungssystem | [1986/32] | English: | Modular data processing system | [1986/32] | French: | Système d'ordinateur modulaire | [1986/32] |
Former [1981/42] | System mit modularem Endgerät | ||
Former [1981/42] | Modular terminal system | ||
Former [1981/42] | Système avec appareil terminal modulaire | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 30.10.1981 | Examination requested [1982/02] | 07.07.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.01.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.11.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 23.01.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.04.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 24.04.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP85100043.0 / EP0157075 | Opposition(s) | 07.05.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.02.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | GB1482819 [ ] (INT STANDARD ELECTRIC CORP); | US4059851 [ ] (NUTTER JR ROY S, et al); | FR2276636 [ ] (LABO CENT TELECOMMUNICAT [FR]); | GB1552086 [ ] (MATRA); | FR2371734 [ ] (MATRA [FR]); | US4079354 [ ] (NITTA ATSUSHI); | DE2638306 [ ] (HITACHI LTD); | US4127896 [ ] (RASLAVSKY III JOHN M) | [ ] - IBM Technical Disclosure Bulletin, Vol. 22, No. 1, June 1979, New York, US ALCOCK et al. "Interface Timeout", pages 302-303. * page 302, lines 8-10; figures 1,3; page 303, lines 1-7, 16-22 * | [ ] - Computer Design, Vol. 19, February 1980, No. 2, Concord, US BARTMAIER: "Multiprocessing System Mixes 8-and 16-bit Microcomputers", pages 137-144. * page 139, second column; page 140, first column, lines 1-25, second column, lines 16-23, figure 3; page 141, first column, lines 9-15 * | [ ] - Electronic Design, Vol. 25, No. 23, 1977 November Rochelle, US POND: "Let Microprocessors Communicate", pages 88-90. * page 89, first column, lines 19-24; figure 3; second column, lines 19-26; page 90, second column, lines 1-14; figure 4 * | [ ] - Electronics, Vol. 52, No. 9, 1979, April New York, US PIEPER et al. "LSI Streamlines Instrument Interface with Standard IEEE-488 bus", pages 145-150. * figure 3 on page 146; page 147, first column, lines 13-27; second column, figure 4 * |