blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0033547

EP0033547 - Outlet branch for a damp extracting hood [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  14.06.1984
Database last updated on 30.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2007Change - inventorpublished on 08.08.2007  [2007/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Georg Röhl Lichttechnische Spezialfabrik Apparate- und Gerätebau GmbH & Co KG
Lilienthalstrasse 18 Postfach
D-8400 Regensburg 1 / DE
[1981/32]
Inventor(s)01 / Homeier, Maximilian
Kohlstatt 11
D-8411 Viehhausen / DE
02 / Röhl-Hager, Hannelore
Schöneberger Strasse 18
D-8400 Regensburg / DE
[1981/32]
Representative(s)advotec.
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft
Tappe mbB
Widenmayerstraße 4
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1981/32]Dr. Elisabeth Jung Dr. Jürgen Schirdewahn Dipl.-Ing. Claus Gernhardt
Postfach 40 14 68
D-80714 München / DE
Application number, filing date81100790.504.02.1981
[1981/32]
Priority number, dateDE1980300393004.02.1980         Original published format: DE 3003930
[1981/32]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0033547
Date:12.08.1981
Language:DE
[1981/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.06.1981
ClassificationIPC:F24C15/20
[1981/32]
CPC:
F24C15/20 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   LU,   NL [1981/32]
TitleGerman:Ausgangsweiche einer Dunstabzugshaube[1981/32]
English:Outlet branch for a damp extracting hood[1981/32]
French:Branchement de sortie pour hotte d'évacuation[1981/32]
File destroyed:14.07.1990
Examination procedure26.10.1981Examination requested  [1982/01]
24.09.1982Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.03.1983Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.09.1983Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.01.1984Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1984/33]
28.02.1984Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [1984/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.02.1983Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
29.02.198404   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:SearchUS3800689  [ ]
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.