blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0040289

EP0040289 - Tensioning arrangement for a vertical conveyor, especially a vertical bucket conveyor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.06.1987
Database last updated on 30.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip03.06.1987No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 22.07.1987 [1987/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bernhard Beumer Maschinenfabrik KG
Oelder Strasse 40
D-59269 Beckum / DE
[1981/47]
Inventor(s)01 / Lauhoff, Heinz, Ing. grad.
Richard-Wagner-Strasse 29
D-4720 Beckum / DE
02 / Bökamp, Alfons, Ing. grad.
Anton-Aulke-Weg 7
D-4740 Oelde-Stromberg / DE
[1981/47]
Representative(s)Hoormann, Walter R., et al
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Pettenkoferstrasse 22
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1981/47]Hoormann, Walter, Dr.-Ing., et al
FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38
D-80801 München / DE
Application number, filing date81100843.206.02.1981
[1981/47]
Priority number, dateDE1980301796910.05.1980         Original published format: DE 3017969
[1981/47]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0040289
Date:25.11.1981
Language:DE
[1981/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0040289
Date:30.07.1986
Language:DE
[1986/31]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.08.1981
ClassificationIPC:B65G23/44
[1981/47]
CPC:
B65G23/44 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [1981/47]
TitleGerman:Spanneinrichtung für einen Senkrechtförderer, insbesondere ein Becherwerk[1981/47]
English:Tensioning arrangement for a vertical conveyor, especially a vertical bucket conveyor[1981/47]
French:Dispositif tendeur pour convoyeur vertical, notamment pour transporteur à godets[1981/47]
Examination procedure16.10.1981Examination requested  [1981/52]
06.07.1982Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.09.1982Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.07.1983Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.01.1984Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.09.1984Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
20.09.1984Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.08.1985Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
12.10.1985Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.01.1986Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
24.01.1986Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.04.1986Fee for grant paid
18.04.1986Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)01.05.1987No opposition filed within time limit [1987/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.02.1983Renewal fee patent year 03
11.02.1984Renewal fee patent year 04
13.02.1985Renewal fee patent year 05
10.02.1986Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]DE7707711U
ExaminationUS1010879
 US1387849
 DE660528
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.