EP0037878 - Manufacture of wood particle boards with a very low emission of formaldehyde [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 07.12.1991 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LEUNA-WERKE AG Am Haupttor D-06236 Leuna / DE | [1991/14] |
Former [1981/42] | For all designated states VEB Leuna-Werke "Walter Ulbricht" O-4220 Leuna 3 / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Barse, Joachim 467/3 DDR-4090 Halle-Neustadt / DD | 02 /
Esser, Gerhard, Dr. Lilienweg 2 DDR-4220 Leuna / DD | 03 /
Kiessling, Wolf, Dr. Otto-Adam-Strasse 11 DDR-7022 Leipzig / DD | 04 /
Lippert, Bernd, Dipl.-Chem. 233/8 DDR-4090 Halle-Neustadt / DD | 05 /
Papstein, Hagen, Dr. 653/9 DDR-4090 Halle-Neustadt / DD | 06 /
Rössing, Peter Feldstrasse 5 DDR-3101 Hohendodeleben / DD | 07 /
Steinke, Ulrich, Dr. Karl-Schurz-Strasse 2 DDR-4020 Halle / DD | 08 /
Winter, Harald, Dr. Windmühlenstrasse 10 DDR-4220 Leuna / DD | [1981/42] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1991/14] |
Former [1981/42] | Puchberger, Rolf, Dipl. Ing., et al Patentanwälte Dipl. Ing. Rolf Puchberger Dipl. Ing. Peter Puchberger Dipl.-Ing. Georg Puchberger Singerstrasse 13 Postfach 55 A-1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 81100887.9 | 09.02.1981 | [1981/42] | Priority number, date | DD19270002191 | 19.02.1980 Original published format: DD 219127 | [1981/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0037878 | Date: | 21.10.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0037878 | Date: | 13.01.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0037878 | Date: | 12.06.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/24] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0037878 | Date: | 22.01.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.1981 | Classification | IPC: | C08L97/02, B27N1/00, // (C08L97/02, 61:00) | [1985/24] | CPC: |
C08L97/02 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08L97/02, C08L2666/14 (EP);
C08L97/02, C08L61/00 (EP) |
Former IPC [1981/42] | C08L97/02, B29J5/00, // (C08L97/02, 61:00) | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, IT, SE [1981/42] | Title | German: | Herstellung von Holzwerkstoffen mit sehr geringer Formaldehydabgabe | [1981/42] | English: | Manufacture of wood particle boards with a very low emission of formaldehyde | [1981/42] | French: | Manufacture de panneaux de bois ayant une émission minimale de formaldéhyde | [1981/42] | Examination procedure | 28.10.1981 | Examination requested [1982/01] | 14.06.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.09.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 03.09.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.11.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 12.11.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
11.03.1986
25.04.1986
ADMISSIBLE BASF Aktiengesellschaft -Patentabteilung - C6- Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/18] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
11.03.1986
25.04.1986
ADMISSIBLE BASF Aktiengesellschaft, Ludwigshafen -Patentabteilung - C6- Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | deleted | Deletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ] | 28.04.1986 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 19.08.1986 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 17.09.1986 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 14.01.1987 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 04.05.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 04.09.1987 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 31.10.1988 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 02.04.1991 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 12.04.1991 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 14.08.1991 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 23.10.1991 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 24.12.1988 | Appeal received No. T0650/88 | 28.02.1989 | Statement of grounds filed | 22.05.1990 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 22.05.1990 | Date of oral proceedings | 25.05.1990 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.02.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.01.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | CH370241 [ ] (BASF AG [DE]); | DE1165248 [ ] (VOELSKOW PETER); | US3649397 [ ] (PETERS THOMAS E); | GB1480787 [ ] (CIBA GEIGY AG); | EP0013447 [ ] (METHANOL CHEMIE NEDERLAND [NL]); | EP0025245 [ ] (METHANOL CHEMIE NEDERLAND [NL], et al) |