EP0034324 - Process for the preservation of flatbed printing formes in their developed state for printing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1981/34] | Process for the preservation of flatbed printing formes | ||
[1984/39] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.09.1985 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.11.1985 [1985/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/34] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schell, Loni Erbacher Strasse 10 D-6238 Hofheim 4 / DE | [1981/34] | Application number, filing date | 81100910.9 | 10.02.1981 | [1981/34] | Priority number, date | DE19803006094 | 19.02.1980 Original published format: DE 3006094 | [1981/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0034324 | Date: | 26.08.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0034324 | Date: | 23.06.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0034324 | Date: | 26.09.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.1982 | Classification | IPC: | B41N3/00, B41N3/08 | [1981/34] | CPC: |
B41N3/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1981/34] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Konservieren von druckfertig entwickelten Flachdruckformen | [1984/39] | English: | Process for the preservation of flatbed printing formes in their developed state for printing | [1984/39] | French: | Procédé pour la conservation de plaques d'impression planes developées et prêtes à l'impression | [1984/39] |
Former [1981/34] | Verfahren zum Konservieren von Flachdruckformen | ||
Former [1981/34] | Process for the preservation of flatbed printing formes | ||
Former [1981/34] | Procédé pour la conservation de plaques d'impression planes | Examination procedure | 30.11.1982 | Examination requested [1983/07] | 24.03.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.09.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 24.10.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 12.03.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 23.05.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.06.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.01.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE1121632 [ ] (KALLE AG); | DE2718869 [ ] (HOECHST CO AMERICAN); | FR2350209 [ ] (HOECHST CO AMERICAN [US]); | EP0012956 [ ] (HOECHST AG [DE]); | US4213887 [ ] (GILLICH THOMAS N [US], et al); | EP0024298 [ ] (HOECHST CO AMERICAN [US]) |