EP0038409 - Process for the preparation of 3-amino-1,2-propane diol [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.03.1986 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.04.1986 [1986/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Degussa GmbH Weissfrauenstrasse 9 60311 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/43] | For all designated states Degussa Aktiengesellschaft Weissfrauenstrasse 9 D-60311 Frankfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kleemann, Axel, Dr. Greifenhagenstrasse 25 D-6450 Hanau 9 / DE | 02 /
Nygren, Robert, Dr. Fürstenbergstrasse 8 D-6450 Hanau 9 / DE | 03 /
Wagner, Rudolf, Dr. Greifenhagenstrasse 9 D-6450 Hanau 9 / DE | [1981/43] | Application number, filing date | 81101248.3 | 21.02.1981 | [1981/43] | Priority number, date | DE19803014109 | 12.04.1980 Original published format: DE 3014109 | [1981/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0038409 | Date: | 28.10.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0038409 | Date: | 02.05.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.08.1981 | Classification | IPC: | C07C89/02, C07C91/10 | [1981/43] | CPC: |
C07C213/04 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C213/04, C07C215/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL [1981/43] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von 1-Amino-propandiol-(2,3) (II) | [1981/43] | English: | Process for the preparation of 3-amino-1,2-propane diol | [1981/43] | French: | Procédé de préparation d'amino-3-propanediol-1,2 | [1981/43] | File destroyed: | 05.09.1996 | Examination procedure | 21.02.1981 | Examination requested [1981/43] | 15.10.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.02.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.01.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 22.08.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.02.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.02.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.02.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.02.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE694992 [ ] (GIRDLER CORP); | US3544632 [ ] (HAARER ERICH, et al); | DE1593774 [ ] (BASF AG) | [ ] - Journal of Organic Chemistry, Band 27, Nr. 6, Juni 12, 1962 K. BAUM et al.: "The Mannich Condensation of 3-Amino-1, 2-Propanediol with 2,2-Dinitropropanol and the Nitration of the Product", seiten 2231-2233 * seite 2232 * | Examination | FR1432428 |