EP0034826 - Electromedicinal heat therapy appliance [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 27.12.1982 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Erbe Elektromedizin GmbH & Co. KG Postfach 1420 D-7400 Tübingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/35] | For all designated states Erbe Elektromedizin GmbH. & Co., KG Postfach 1420 D-7400 Tübingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Farin, Günter Kapellenweg 15 D-7400 Tübingen-Hirschau / DE | 02 /
Fischer, Klaus Tulpenweg 9 D-7306 Denkendorf / DE | [1981/35] | Representative(s) | Endlich, Fritz Patentanwalt, Postfach 13 26 D-82101 Germering / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/35] | Endlich, Fritz, Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwalt, Postfach 13 26 D-82101 Germering / DE | Application number, filing date | 81101267.3 | 21.02.1981 | [1981/35] | Priority number, date | DE19800004905U | 23.02.1980 Original published format: DE 8004905 U | [1981/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0034826 | Date: | 02.09.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.06.1981 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/40, A61N5/04, // F16M11/40 | [1981/35] | CPC: |
A61N5/04 (EP);
A61N1/403 (EP);
F16M11/40 (EP);
F16M11/42 (EP);
F16M2200/066 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, GB, NL [1981/35] | Title | German: | Elektromedizinisches Wärmetherapiegerät | [1981/35] | English: | Electromedicinal heat therapy appliance | [1981/35] | French: | Appareil électro-médical de thérapie thermique | [1981/35] | File destroyed: | 18.06.1989 | Examination procedure | 27.10.1981 | Examination requested [1982/01] | 09.09.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.1982 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1983/09] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE859045 [ ] |