Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3100941 | 27.06.1985 | C2 | DE3100941 | 05.08.1982 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3007485 | 28.02.1980 | DE3100941 | 14.01.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0036108 | Global Dossier | 07.09.1983 | A3 | EP0036108 | 23.09.1981 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE3007485 | 28.02.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3007485 | 10.09.1981 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3007485 | 28.02.1980 |