EP0036108 - Electrical device to measure heat consumption of individual consumers of a singular heat source [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.02.1984 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schultz, Johannes Friedrich-Koenig-Strasse 3-5 D-6800 Mannheim 1 / DE | For all designated states Völker, Karl Friedrich-Koenig-Strasse 3-5 D-6800 Mannheim 1 / DE | [1981/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schultz, Johannes Friedrich-Koenig-Strasse 3-5 D-6800 Mannheim 1 / DE | 02 /
Völker, Karl Friedrich-Koenig-Strasse 3-5 D-6800 Mannheim 1 / DE | 03 /
Braun, Lothar Friedrich-Koenig-Strasse 3-5 D-6800 Mannheim 1 / DE | [1981/38] | Representative(s) | Ratzel, Gerhard Seckenheimer Strasse 36a 68165 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/38] | Ratzel, Gerhard, Dr. Seckenheimer Strasse 36a D-68165 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 81101310.1 | 24.02.1981 | [1981/38] | Priority number, date | DE19803007485 | 28.02.1980 Original published format: DE 3007485 | [1981/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0036108 | Date: | 23.09.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0036108 | Date: | 07.09.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.1983 | Classification | IPC: | G01K17/08 | [1981/38] | CPC: |
G01K17/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1981/38] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur elektrischen Verbrauchsermittlung einzelner Wärmeverbraucher, die von einer Wärmequelle versorgt werden | [1981/38] | English: | Electrical device to measure heat consumption of individual consumers of a singular heat source | [1981/38] | French: | Dispositif électrique pour mesurer la consommation indivuelle de chaleur d'une source unique | [1981/38] | File destroyed: | 14.07.1990 | Examination procedure | 03.02.1982 | Examination requested [1982/15] | 07.02.1984 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1984/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB299880 ; | [X]DE2364573 ; | [X]DE2320359 ; | [X]DE2718587 ; | [A]DE1801554 ; | [Y]US3355949 ; | [Y]FR2420125 |