EP0032407 - A process for the production of phosphoric acid [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.08.1982 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Occidental Petroleum Corporation 10989 Wilshire Boulevard Los Angeles California 90024 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1981/29] | For all designated states Occidental Petroleum Corporation 10989 Wilshire Boulevard Los Angeles California 90024 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ore, Fernando N. 14732 Glenn Drive Whittier California 90602 / US | 02 /
Ellis, John David 7311 Mast Drive Huntingdon Beach California 92648 / US | 03 /
Moore, James Harold 1294 Ruggles La Verne California 91750 / US | 04 /
Gragg, Fredrick Michael 2040 Benbow Place Riverside California 92506 / US | 05 /
Adams, Allen Salter 1418 Fieldcrest Drive Jasper Florida 32052 / US | 06 /
Self, James P.O. Box 300 White Springs Florida 32096 / US | 07 /
Caesar, Michael Brian 1326 Bali Lake City Florida 32055 / US | [1981/29] | Representative(s) | Jack, Bruce J., et al Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/29] | Jack, Bruce James, et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 D-80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 81101803.5 | 29.12.1978 | [1981/29] | Priority number, date | US19770865556 | 29.12.1977 Original published format: US 865556 | US19780866990 | 05.01.1978 Original published format: US 866990 | US19780866989 | 05.01.1978 Original published format: US 866989 | US19780866988 | 05.01.1978 Original published format: US 866988 | US19780866987 | 05.01.1978 Original published format: US 866987 | US19780867556 | 06.01.1978 Original published format: US 867556 | US19780909896 | 26.05.1978 Original published format: US 909896 | [1981/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0032407 | Date: | 22.07.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0032407 | Date: | 17.02.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.1981 | Classification | IPC: | C01B25/223 | [1981/29] | CPC: |
B01D19/02 (EP);
B01F21/02 (EP);
B01F21/10 (EP);
B01F21/30 (EP);
B01F23/023 (EP);
B01F33/4094 (EP);
B01J16/00 (EP);
B01J19/1875 (EP);
C01B25/2204 (EP);
C01B25/223 (EP);
C01B25/225 (EP);
C01B25/226 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1981/29] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Erzeugung von Phosphorsäure | [1981/29] | English: | A process for the production of phosphoric acid | [1981/29] | French: | Procédé de production d'acide phosphorique | [1981/29] | Examination procedure | 11.03.1981 | Examination requested [1981/29] | 26.07.1982 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1982/40] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP78300924.4 / EP0003266 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | GB1220963 [ ] (NISSAN CHEMICAL IND LTD [JP]) |