EP0036580 - Junction device by means of a disconnection switch between two orthogonal metal-clad bus sets [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.06.1985 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.08.1985 [1985/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALSTHOM-ATLANTIQUE Société anonyme dite: 38, Avenue Kléber F-75784 Paris Cédex 16 / FR | [1981/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cretin, Jean-Loup 87, rue du 1er Mars F-69100 Villeurbanne / FR | [1981/39] | Representative(s) | Weinmiller, Jürgen, et al Spott, Weinmiller & Böhm Patentanwälte Sendlinger-Tor-Platz 11 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/39] | Weinmiller, Jürgen, et al Lennéstrasse 9 Postfach 24 D-82336 Feldafing / DE | Application number, filing date | 81101849.8 | 13.03.1981 | [1981/39] | Priority number, date | FR19800006232 | 20.03.1980 Original published format: FR 8006232 | [1981/39] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0036580 | Date: | 30.09.1981 | Language: | FR | [1981/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0036580 | Date: | 15.08.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.1981 | Classification | IPC: | H02B13/02 | [1981/39] | CPC: |
H02B13/0352 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, IT, NL [1981/39] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Verbinden mittels eines Trennschalters zwischen zwei gekapselten rechtwinkligen Sammelschienen | [1981/39] | English: | Junction device by means of a disconnection switch between two orthogonal metal-clad bus sets | [1981/39] | French: | Dispositif de liaison par sectionneur entre deux jeux de barres orthogonaux sous enveloppes métalliques | [1981/39] | Examination procedure | 16.03.1982 | Examination requested [1982/21] | 10.11.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 07.02.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.04.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 26.04.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.05.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR2346884 [ ] (MERLIN GERIN [FR]); | FR2379900 [ ] (MERLIN GERIN [FR]) |