EP0060310 - Insert sleeve [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.05.1986 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR State(s) deleted from list of lapses: GB | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WOCO Franz-Josef Wolf & Co. Sprudelallee 19 63628 Bad Soden-Salmünster / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/38] | For all designated states WOCO Franz-Josef Wolf & Co. Sprudelallee 19 D-63628 Bad Soden-Salmünster / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wolf, Franz Josef Sprudelallee 19 D-6483 Bad Soden-Salmünster / DE | 02 /
Kaminski, Peter Festplatzstrasse 5 D-6480 Wächtersbach-Aufenau / DE | [1982/38] | Representative(s) | Jaeger, Klaus, et al propindus Patentanwälte NIEDMERS JAEGER KÖSTER Auguste-Viktoria-Allee 87 13403 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/38] | Jaeger, Klaus, Dipl.-Chem. Dr., et al Jaeger, Steffens & Köster Patentanwälte Pippinplatz 4a D-8035 München-Gauting / DE | Application number, filing date | 81101851.4 | 12.03.1981 | [1982/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0060310 | Date: | 22.09.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0060310 | Date: | 17.07.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.1981 | Classification | IPC: | F16L37/00, F16L17/02, F16L21/00 | [1985/29] | CPC: |
F16L17/04 (EP);
F16L37/091 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1982/38] | F16L37/08, F16L17/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1982/38] | Title | German: | Steckmuffe | [1982/38] | English: | Insert sleeve | [1982/38] | French: | Manchon à garniture | [1982/38] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 22.03.1983 | Examination requested [1983/23] | 21.03.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.04.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 03.10.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 18.12.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.04.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 17.07.1985 | FR | 17.07.1985 | IT | 17.07.1985 | NL | 17.07.1985 | SE | 30.07.1985 | AT | 12.03.1986 | CH | 31.03.1986 | LI | 31.03.1986 | [2002/24] |
Former [1999/42] | BE | 17.07.1985 | |
IT | 17.07.1985 | ||
NL | 17.07.1985 | ||
SE | 30.07.1985 | ||
AT | 12.03.1986 | ||
GB | 12.03.1986 | ||
CH | 31.03.1986 | ||
LI | 31.03.1986 | ||
Former [1989/27] | BE | 17.07.1985 | |
NL | 17.07.1985 | ||
SE | 30.07.1985 | ||
AT | 12.03.1986 | ||
GB | 12.03.1986 | ||
CH | 31.03.1986 | ||
LI | 31.03.1986 | ||
Former [1989/22] | BE | 17.07.1985 | |
NL | 17.07.1985 | ||
SE | 30.07.1985 | ||
AT | 12.03.1986 | ||
CH | 31.03.1986 | ||
LI | 31.03.1986 | ||
Former [1989/08] | BE | 17.07.1985 | |
NL | 17.07.1985 | ||
SE | 30.07.1985 | ||
AT | 12.03.1986 | ||
Former [1988/13] | BE | 17.07.1985 | |
NL | 17.07.1985 | ||
SE | 30.07.1985 | ||
Former [1988/04] | BE | 17.07.1985 | |
NL | 17.07.1985 | ||
Former [1986/31] | NL | 17.07.1985 | Documents cited: | Search | US1926197 [ ] (DURR ARTHUR W); | DE1188879 [ ] (TORFIT WERKE G A HASEKE & CO); | BE741333 [ ]; | LU62127 [ ]; | DE2059311 [ ] (INT D APPLIC DE PROCEDES IND S); | US3837683 [ ] (TAYLOR T); | DE2346344 [ ] (ANTHES IMPERIAL LTD) | Examination | DE2604099 | DE2756540 | EP0002118 |