EP0036197 - Hydraulic fluid reservoir for vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 15.11.1983 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1981/38] | For all designated states DEERE & COMPANY 1 John Deere Road Moline, Illinois 61265 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bennink, Clarence Clyde R.R. 4 Ottumwa Iowa 52501 / US | [1981/38] | Representative(s) | Fricke, Joachim, et al Döring, Einsel, Leonhard, Fricke Patentanwälte Josephspitalstrasse 7 D-80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/38] | Fricke, Joachim, Dr., et al Döring, Einsel, Leonhard, Fricke Patentanwälte Josephspitalstrasse 7 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 81101883.7 | 13.03.1981 | [1981/38] | Priority number, date | US19800130389 | 14.03.1980 Original published format: US 130389 | [1981/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0036197 | Date: | 23.09.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.1981 | Classification | IPC: | A01D69/00, F15B1/06 | [1981/38] | CPC: |
F15B1/26 (EP,US);
A01D69/03 (EP,US);
Y10T137/0874 (EP,US);
Y10T137/6892 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1981/38] | Title | German: | Hydrauliköl-Reservoir für Fahrzeuge | [1981/38] | English: | Hydraulic fluid reservoir for vehicle | [1981/38] | French: | Réservoir de fluide hydraulique pour véhicule | [1981/38] | File destroyed: | 18.06.1989 | Examination procedure | 09.03.1982 | Examination requested [1982/20] | 05.01.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.04.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.1983 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1984/03] | 12.08.1983 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1984/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3665685 [ ] (ALLARD JEAN) |