EP0038442 - Refrigeration circuit incorporating a subcooler [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1981/43] | Method and apparatus for integrating components of a refrigeration system | ||
[1986/08] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.12.1986 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.12.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.02.1987 [1987/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CARRIER CORPORATION Carrier Tower 6304 Carrier Parkway P.O. Box 4800 Syracuse New York 13221 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1981/43] | For all designated states CARRIER CORPORATION Carrier Tower 6304 Carrier Parkway P.O. Box 4800 Syracuse New York 13221 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Manning, John D. 1817 Lenox Road Schenectady New York / US | [1981/43] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/08] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | ||
Former [1981/43] | Baillie, Iain Cameron c/o Ladas & Parry Isartorplatz 5 D-8000 München 2 / DE | Application number, filing date | 81102414.0 | 31.03.1981 | [1981/43] | Priority number, date | US19800142517 | 21.04.1980 Original published format: US 142517 | [1981/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0038442 | Date: | 28.10.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0038442 | Date: | 23.06.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0038442 | Date: | 19.02.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.1982 | Classification | IPC: | F25B5/00, F25B49/00 | [1981/43] | CPC: |
F25B40/02 (EP,US);
F25B5/00 (EP,US);
F25B2400/13 (EP,US);
F25B2600/2509 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [1981/43] | Title | German: | Kühlkreislauf mit Unterkühler | [1986/08] | English: | Refrigeration circuit incorporating a subcooler | [1986/08] | French: | Circuit de réfrigération comportant un sous-refroidisseur | [1986/08] |
Former [1981/43] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Integration von Einzelteilen in einem Kühlsystem | ||
Former [1981/43] | Method and apparatus for integrating components of a refrigeration system | ||
Former [1981/43] | Méthode et dispositif pour intégrer des composants d'un système frigorifique | Examination procedure | 14.12.1982 | Examination requested [1983/09] | 06.09.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.03.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.12.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 12.08.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.10.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 25.10.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.11.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | JPS5391446 [ ] (HITACHI LTD); | CH123576 [ ] (ESCHER WYSS MASCHF AG [CH]); | US3500653 [ ] (ANDERSON ROBERT V); | US2244376 [ ] (SPOFFORD WARREN A); | US4230470 [ ] (MATSUDA TOSHIHARU, et al); | DE2620511 [ ] (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE); | US2487012 [ ] (ZEARFOSS JR ELMER W); | US3257819 [ ] (MALONEY JAMES E); | US3349840 [ ] (TOPE PAUL H, et al) |