EP0037987 - Method for the manufacture of foamed core-supported moulded articles such as wings, rotor blades, etc. of great dimension in length and width [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.08.1988 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.09.1988 [1988/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Messerschmitt-Bölkow-Blohm Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung 81663 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/31] | For all designated states Messerschmitt-Bölkow-Blohm Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung D-81663 München / DE | ||
Former [1981/42] | For all designated states Messerschmitt-Bölkow-Blohm Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung Robert-Koch-Strasse D-8012 Ottobrunn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hahn, Michael, Dipl.-Ing. Bahnhofstrasse 15 b D-8012 Ottobrunn / DE | 02 /
Wackerle, Peter-Martin, Dipl.-Ing. Oderweg 7 D-8012 Ottobrunn / DE | [1981/42] | Application number, filing date | 81102524.6 | 03.04.1981 | [1981/42] | Priority number, date | DE19803014347 | 15.04.1980 Original published format: DE 3014347 | [1981/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0037987 | Date: | 21.10.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0037987 | Date: | 10.10.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0037987 | Date: | 07.10.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.08.1984 | Classification | IPC: | B29C39/12, B29C67/20, F03D1/06, B64C3/24 | [1987/41] | CPC: |
B29D99/0025 (EP);
B29C44/12 (EP);
B29C44/1223 (EP);
B29C44/56 (EP);
B29C70/34 (EP);
B29D99/0028 (EP);
B64C3/24 (EP);
F03D1/0675 (EP);
B29K2105/06 (EP);
B29L2031/08 (EP);
B29L2031/082 (EP);
F05B2240/30 (EP);
|
Former IPC [1984/39] | B29D27/04, F03D1/06, B64C3/24 | ||
Former IPC [1981/42] | B29D27/04, B64C3/24 | Designated contracting states | BE, FR, NL [1981/42] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von schaumkerngestützten Formkörpern wie Flügeln, Rotorblättern etc. grosser Längen- und Breitenausdehnung | [1981/42] | English: | Method for the manufacture of foamed core-supported moulded articles such as wings, rotor blades, etc. of great dimension in length and width | [1981/42] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de corps moulés soutenus par un noyau cellulaire tels que des ailes, des pales de rotor, etc. de grande dimension en longueur et en largeur | [1981/42] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 02.10.1984 | Examination requested [1984/52] | 02.08.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.08.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.01.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 03.10.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.11.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 14.11.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.07.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.04.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1987 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   26.06.1987 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE1045810 (ALLGAIER WERKE GMBH); | [Y]DE1629628 (SUD AVIATION); | [Y]US3055437 (STACK GEORGE R); | [X]FR2186380 (UNITED AIRCRAFT CORP [US]); | [A]DE1531369 (MESSERSCHMITT BOELKOW BLOHM) |