Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] |
18.04.1984 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.06.1984 [1984/25] |
04.02.1983 | Change - request for examination | published on 06.04.1983 [1983/14] |
12.01.1983 | Request for examination filed | published on 16.03.1983 [1983/11] |
28.04.1982 | Publication of search report | published on 30.06.1982 [1982/26] |
19.09.1981 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 18.11.1981 [1981/46] |