EP0038493 - Power steering apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.05.1986 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.06.1986 [1986/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TRW INC. 23555 Euclid Avenue Cleveland Ohio 44117 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1981/43] | For all designated states TRW INC. 23555 Euclid Avenue Cleveland Ohio 44117 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Atkin, Rupert Lloyd 22021 Shorepointe Lane St. Clair Shores Michigan 48080 / US | [1981/43] | Representative(s) | Leiser, Gottfried, et al Prinz & Partner GbR Manzingerweg 7 81241 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/43] | Leiser, Gottfried, Dipl.-Ing., et al Prinz & Partner, Manzingerweg 7 D-81241 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 81102757.2 | 10.04.1981 | [1981/43] | Priority number, date | US19800140451 | 17.04.1980 Original published format: US 140451 | [1981/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0038493 | Date: | 28.10.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0038493 | Date: | 28.04.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0038493 | Date: | 10.07.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.1982 | Classification | IPC: | B62D5/06 | [1981/43] | CPC: |
B62D5/083 (EP,US);
B62D5/12 (EP,US);
Y10T137/86662 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1981/43] | Title | German: | Kraftlenkvorrichtung | [1981/43] | English: | Power steering apparatus | [1981/43] | French: | Dispositif de direction assistée | [1981/43] | Examination procedure | 20.10.1982 | Examination requested [1982/52] | 09.01.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 14.06.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 21.12.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 27.02.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.04.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]SU656901 ; | [X]US2829624 (PARKES PHILIP G); | [A]GB841957 (BENDIX AVIAT CORP); | [YD]US3709099 (DUMEAH P); | [A]GB1439038 (THOMAS K H, et al) | [Y] - Soviet Inventions Illustrated Week C01, 13 February 1980, Section Q 22 & SU-A-656 901, & SU656901 A 00000000 |