Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Event history: EP0040330


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
28.11.1985 No opposition filed within time limit published on  29.01.1986 [1986/05]
01.12.1984 (Expected) grant published on  30.01.1985 [1985/05]
28.10.1981 Request for examination filed published on  30.12.1981 [1981/52]
26.09.1981 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  25.11.1981 [1981/47]