blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0040330

EP0040330 - Process for producing alpha-olefin homo and co-polymers with a Ziegler-Natta catalytic system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.11.1985
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip28.11.1985No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 29.01.1986 [1986/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BASF Aktiengesellschaft
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
67063 Ludwigshafen / DE
[N/P]
Former [1981/47]For all designated states
BASF Aktiengesellschaft
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Jaggard, James F. R., Dr.
Bruesseler Ring 45
D-6700 Ludwigshafen / DE
02 / Klaerner, Peter, Dr.
Hauptstrasse 62
D-6719 Battenberg / DE
03 / Schweier, Guenther, Dr.
Friedrich-Pietzsch-Strasse 14
D-6701 Friedelsheim / DE
[1985/05]
Former [1981/47]01 / Jaggard, James F. R., Dr.
Bruesseler Ring 45
D-6700 Ludwigshafen / DE
02 / Klaerner, Peter, Dr.
Hauptstrasse 62
D-6719 Battenberg / DE
03 / Schweier, Guenther
Friedrich-Pietzsch-Strasse 14
D-6701 Friedelsheim / DE
Application number, filing date81103001.418.04.1981
[1981/47]
Priority number, dateDE1980301811312.05.1980         Original published format: DE 3018113
[1981/47]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0040330
Date:25.11.1981
Language:DE
[1981/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0040330
Date:30.01.1985
Language:DE
[1985/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.09.1981
ClassificationIPC:C08F10/00, C08F4/64
[1981/47]
CPC:
C08F10/00 (EP,US); Y10S526/906 (EP,US)
C-Set:
C08F10/00, C08F4/651 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1981/47]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Herstellen von Homo- und Copolymerisaten von alpha-Monoolefinen mittels eines Ziegler-Natta-Katalysatorsystems[1981/47]
English:Process for producing alpha-olefin homo and co-polymers with a Ziegler-Natta catalytic system[1981/47]
French:Procédé de préparation d'homo- et copolymères d'alpha-oléfines à l'aide d'un système catalytique Ziegler-Natta[1981/47]
Examination procedure22.10.1981Examination requested  [1981/52]
12.10.1982Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.01.1983Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.10.1983Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.02.1984Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.06.1984Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
20.07.1984Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.09.1984Fee for grant paid
13.09.1984Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)31.10.1985No opposition filed within time limit [1986/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.04.1983Renewal fee patent year 03
14.04.1984Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]DE1570919  (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS);
 DE2730965  [ ] (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO);
 [D]DE2658939  (BASF AG);
 [D]DE2841645  (BASF AG);
 EP0009724  [ ] (BASF AG [DE])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.