EP0038556 - Engine cooling system providing mixed or unmixed head and block cooling [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.12.1984 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1984/31] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken 471 / JP | ||
Former [1983/52] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken 471 / JP | ||
Former [1981/43] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken 471 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hirayama, Tsutomu 1321-3038, Mishuku Susono-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | [1981/43] | Representative(s) | Tiedtke, Harro, et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Tiedtke, Harro, et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1985/04] | Tiedtke, Harro, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1983/22] | Tiedtke, Harro, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1981/43] | Tiedtke, Harro, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne- Grupe-Pellmann Bavariaring 4 D-8000 München 2 / DE | Application number, filing date | 81103017.0 | 21.04.1981 | [1981/43] | Priority number, date | JP19800052025 | 18.04.1980 Original published format: JP 5202580 | [1981/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0038556 | Date: | 28.10.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0038556 | Date: | 25.01.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.08.1981 | Classification | IPC: | F01P7/16 | [1981/43] | CPC: |
F01P7/164 (EP,US);
F01P7/165 (EP,US);
F01P7/167 (EP,US);
F01P2003/027 (EP,US);
F01P2005/105 (EP,US);
F01P2025/08 (EP,US);
F01P2025/30 (EP,US);
F01P2025/32 (EP,US);
F01P2025/40 (EP,US);
F01P2025/50 (EP,US);
F01P2025/62 (EP,US);
F01P2025/64 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1981/43] | Title | German: | Motoren-Kühlsystem für gemischte oder ungemischte Zylinderkopf- und Motorblock-Kühlung | [1981/43] | English: | Engine cooling system providing mixed or unmixed head and block cooling | [1981/43] | French: | Circuit de refroidissement de moteur permettant un refroidissement commun ou séparé de la culasse et du bloc cylindre | [1981/43] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 30.10.1981 | Examination requested [1982/02] | 04.08.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.12.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 12.07.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.10.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 12.10.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.10.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US1985240 [ ] (BRUBAKER JACOB Z); | US4212270 [ ] (NAKANISHI KIYOSHI [JP], et al); | FR2455174 [ ] (SEV MARCHAL); | FR2436878 [ ] (AUDI AG [DE]); | US3211374 [ ] (MATULAITIS VICTOR E); | US1747868 [ ] (GUERNSEY CHARLES O); | GB646201 [ ] (THORNYCROFT JOHN I & CO LTD) |