EP0038569 - Deazapurine nucleosides, formulations and preparation thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.12.1985 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.02.1986 [1986/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE WELLCOME FOUNDATION LIMITED Unicorn House 160 Euston Road P.O. Box 129 London NW1 2BP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1981/43] | For all designated states THE WELLCOME FOUNDATION LIMITED Unicorn House 160 Euston Road London NW1 2BP / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rideout, Janet Litster 3101 Morningside Drive Raleigh North Carolina 27607 / US | 02 /
Krenitsky, Thomas Anthony 106 Laurel Hill Road Chapel Hill North Carolina 27514 / US | [1981/43] | Representative(s) | Sandmair, Kurt, et al Patentanwälte Schwabe, Sandmair, Marx Postfach 86 02 45 81629 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/44] | Sandmair, Kurt, Dr. Dr., et al Patentanwälte Schwabe, Sandmair, Marx Postfach 86 02 45 D-81629 München / DE | ||
Former [1981/43] | Berg, Wilhelm, Dr. Patentanwälte Dr. Berg Dipl.-Ing. Stapf Dipl.-Ing. Schwabe Dr. Dr. Sandmair Postfach 86 02 45 Stuntzstrasse 16 D-8000 München 86 / DE | Application number, filing date | 81103045.1 | 22.04.1981 | [1981/43] | Priority number, date | GB19800013410 | 23.04.1980 Original published format: GB 8013410 | [1981/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0038569 | Date: | 28.10.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0038569 | Date: | 09.12.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0038569 | Date: | 30.01.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.1981 | Classification | IPC: | C07H19/04, A61K31/70, // C12P19/38 | [1981/43] | CPC: |
C07H19/052 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1981/43] | Title | German: | Deazapurin-Nukleoside, die sie enthaltenden pharmazeutischen Zubereitungen und ihre Herstellung | [1981/43] | English: | Deazapurine nucleosides, formulations and preparation thereof | [1981/43] | French: | Déazapurine nucléosides, compositions pharmaceutiques et leur préparation | [1981/43] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 02.06.1982 | Examination requested [1982/33] | 30.09.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.01.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.01.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 17.07.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.09.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 14.09.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.10.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [D]FR1324011 (HOECHST AG); | [D]US4148888 (CANTONI GIULIO L, et al); | [P]EP0010668 (WELLCOME FOUND [GB]) |