EP0063618 - Edge dam assembly for paper coating apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.06.1986 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CONSOLIDATED PAPERS, INC. 231 1st Avenue North Wisconsin Rapids Wisconsin 54495 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1982/44] | For all designated states CONSOLIDATED PAPERS, INC. 231 1st Avenue North Wisconsin Rapids Wisconsin 54494 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Damrau, Wayne A. 6540 Wazeecha Ridge Court Wisconsin Rapids Wisconsin 54494 / US | [1982/44] | Representative(s) | Leiser, Gottfried, et al Prinz & Partner GbR Manzingerweg 7 81241 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/03] | Leiser, Gottfried, Dipl.-Ing., et al Prinz & Partner, Manzingerweg 7 D-81241 München / DE | ||
Former [1982/44] | Leiser, Gottfried, Dipl.-Ing. Prinz & Partner, Manzingerweg 7 D-81241 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 81103064.2 | 23.04.1981 | [1982/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0063618 | Date: | 03.11.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0063618 | Date: | 07.08.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.1982 | Classification | IPC: | B05C3/12, D21H5/00, B05C3/18 | [1982/44] | CPC: |
D21H23/40 (EP);
B05C3/125 (EP);
B05C5/0266 (EP);
D21H5/0015 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1982/44] | Title | German: | Kantenabschlussvorrichtung für einen Papierüberzugsapparat | [1982/44] | English: | Edge dam assembly for paper coating apparatus | [1982/44] | French: | Dispositif de fermeture des bords d'un appareil d'enduction du papier | [1985/32] |
Former [1982/44] | Dispositif de barrage pour les bords d'un appareil pour enduire du papier | Examination procedure | 22.04.1983 | Examination requested [1983/27] | 23.03.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 25.01.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.04.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 23.04.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.05.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/30] | Request for further processing for: | 28.09.1984 | Request for further processing filed | 28.09.1984 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.10.1984 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.04.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 07.08.1985 | CH | 07.08.1985 | LI | 07.08.1985 | NL | 07.08.1985 | LU | 30.04.1986 | [1999/52] |
Former [1989/19] | BE | 07.08.1985 | |
CH | 07.08.1985 | ||
LI | 07.08.1985 | ||
NL | 07.08.1985 | ||
Former [1988/04] | BE | 07.08.1985 | |
NL | 07.08.1985 | ||
Former [1986/32] | NL | 07.08.1985 | Documents cited: | Search | US4250211 [ ]; | US3078825 [ ]; | US4034707 [ ]; | GB1166862 [ ] |