EP0039905 - Process for the preparation of 2-chloro-benzothiazole [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.08.1984 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1989 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.04.1989 [1989/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CASSELLA Aktiengesellschaft Hanauer Landstrasse 526 D-60386 Frankfurt / DE | [1981/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kühlein, Klaus, Dr. Fasanenstrasse 41 D-6233 Kelkheim/Taunus / DE | 02 /
Kussmaul, Ulrich, Dr. Ulmenweg 1 D-6369 Niederdorfelden / DE | [1981/46] | Representative(s) | Urbach, Hans-Georg, et al Hanauer Landstrasse 526 60386 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/46] | Urbach, Hans-Georg, Dr., et al Hanauer Landstrasse 526 D-60386 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 81103452.9 | 07.05.1981 | [1981/46] | Priority number, date | DE19803018088 | 12.05.1980 Original published format: DE 3018088 | [1981/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0039905 | Date: | 18.11.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0039905 | Date: | 02.11.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.1981 | Classification | IPC: | C07D277/68 | [1981/46] | CPC: |
C07D277/68 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1981/46] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von 2-Chlorbenzothiazol | [1981/46] | English: | Process for the preparation of 2-chloro-benzothiazole | [1981/46] | French: | Procédé de préparation de 2-chloro benzothiazole | [1981/46] | Examination procedure | 26.09.1981 | Examination requested [1981/49] | 10.03.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.07.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 28.10.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 18.03.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.05.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 30.05.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.08.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 08.05.1984 | [1989/17] | Documents cited: | Search | DE1670706 [ ] (BAYER AG) | Examination | DE2213865 | DE2451632 |