EP0040739 - Arrangement for reproduction of a sound recording by headphones [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1981/48] | Method for acoustic reproduction of a sonic recording, and arrangement for carrying out this method | ||
[1987/35] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.06.1988 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.08.1988 [1988/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pfleiderer, Peter Michael, Dipl.-Ing. Blumenstrasse 30 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/48] | For all designated states Pfleiderer, Peter Michael, Dipl.-Ing. Blumenstrasse 30 D-80331 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1981/48] | Representative(s) | Boeters, Hans Dietrich, et al BOETERS & LIECK Oberanger 32 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/01] | Boeters, Hans Dietrich, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Boeters & Bauer, Bereiteranger 15 D-81541 München / DE | ||
Former [1981/52] | Boeters, Hans Dietrich, Dr. Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 14 D-8000 München 22 / DE | ||
Former [1981/48] | Boeters, Hans Dietrich, Dr. Boeters, Bauer & Partner Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 14 D-8000 München 22 / DE | Application number, filing date | 81103539.3 | 08.05.1981 | [1981/48] | Priority number, date | DE19803017854 | 09.05.1980 Original published format: DE 3017854 | DE19813112874 | 31.03.1981 Original published format: DE 3112874 | [1981/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0040739 | Date: | 02.12.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0040739 | Date: | 26.08.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.09.1981 | Classification | IPC: | H04S1/00, H04S5/00 | [1981/48] | CPC: |
H04S1/005 (EP,US);
H04S5/00 (EP,US);
H04R2225/43 (EP,US);
H04S2420/05 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL, SE [1981/48] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung für die Wiedergabe einer Tonaufnahme über Kopfhörer | [1987/35] | English: | Arrangement for reproduction of a sound recording by headphones | [1987/35] | French: | Dispositif pour la reproduction par écouteurs d'un enregistrement sonore | [1987/35] |
Former [1981/48] | Verfahren zur akustischen Wiedergabe einer Tonaufnahme und Vorrichtung zur Durchführung des Verfahrens | ||
Former [1981/48] | Method for acoustic reproduction of a sonic recording, and arrangement for carrying out this method | ||
Former [1981/48] | Méthode pour la reproduction acoustique d'un enregistrement sonore et dispositif pour la mise en oeuvre de cette méthode | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 11.03.1982 | Examination requested [1982/21] | 26.11.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.03.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 20.11.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 28.02.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.05.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.04.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.03.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3970787 [ ] (SEARLE CAMPBELL L); | FR2316826 [ ] (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]); | US4136260 [ ] (ASAHI NOBUMITSU) | [ ] - Journal of the Audio Engineering Society, Band 6, Heft 2, April 1958, seiten 74-79 New York, U.S.A. M.R. SCHROEDER: "An Artificial Stereophonic Effect Obtained from a Single Audio Signal" * seite 74, rechte spalte, zeile 6- seite 78, rechte spalte, zeile 32; figuren * |