blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0041634

EP0041634 - Coffee aromatisation process [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.05.1984
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip22.05.1984No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 25.07.1984 [1984/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SOCIETE DES PRODUITS NESTLE S.A.
Case postale 353
1800 Vevey / CH
[N/P]
Former [1981/50]For all designated states
SOCIETE DES PRODUITS NESTLE S.A.
Case postale 353
CH-1800 Vevey / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Liu, Richard Tien-Szu
6855 Downs Street
Worthington Ohio 53085 / US
[1981/50]
Application number, filing date81103869.420.05.1981
[1981/50]
Priority number, dateUS1980015616603.06.1980         Original published format: US 156166
[1981/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0041634
Date:16.12.1981
Language:EN
[1981/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0041634
Date:13.07.1983
Language:EN
[1983/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.09.1981
ClassificationIPC:A23F5/50, // A23F5/26
[1981/50]
CPC:
A23F5/26 (EP); A23F5/505 (EP)
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   LI,   NL [1981/50]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Aromatisieren von Kaffee[1981/50]
English:Coffee aromatisation process[1981/50]
French:Procédé d'aromatisation de café[1981/50]
Examination procedure20.05.1981Examination requested  [1981/50]
04.06.1982Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01)
11.06.1982Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.10.1982Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
01.12.1982Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.01.1983Fee for grant paid
20.01.1983Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.04.1984No opposition filed within time limit [1984/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.03.1983Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:SearchFR1316817  [ ] (AFICO SA);
 GB982521  [ ] (NESTLE SA);
 US3223534  [ ] (KELLY EDGAR J);
 US3223533  [ ] (KELLY EDGAR J);
 US3248233  [ ] (ALLEN BRENT JEWELL, et al);
 CA1001476  [ ] (PROCTER & GAMBLE)
    [ ] - M. SIVETZ et al.: "Coffee Processing Technology, Vol. 1, 1963, The AVI Publishing Company Inc. Westport Connecticut (US) pages 297-301 *pages 297-301*
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.