EP0041189 - Process for the production of Interferon II and stimulated clones for carrying out the process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.05.1984 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.07.1984 [1984/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stiftung Deutsches Krebsforschungszentrum Im Neuenheimer Feld 280 D-6900 Heidelberg 1 / DE | [1981/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Krammer, Peter, Dr. Bunsenstrasse 19a D-6900 Heidelberg / DE | 02 /
Kirchner, Holger, Prof.Dr. Häusserstrasse 33 D-6900 Heidelberg / DE | 03 /
Marcucci, Fabrizio, Dr. Unterer Burggarten 19 D-6901 Dossenheim / DE | [1981/49] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/49] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 D-81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 81103918.9 | 21.05.1981 | [1981/49] | Priority number, date | DE19803019621 | 22.05.1980 Original published format: DE 3019621 | DE19813104900 | 11.02.1981 Original published format: DE 3104900 | [1981/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0041189 | Date: | 09.12.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0041189 | Date: | 22.06.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.1981 | Classification | IPC: | C12P21/00, A61K45/02 | [1981/49] | CPC: |
C07K14/57 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1981/49] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Interferon II und stimulierte Klone zur Durchführung des Verfahrens | [1981/49] | English: | Process for the production of Interferon II and stimulated clones for carrying out the process | [1981/49] | French: | Procédé de préparation de l'Interféron II et clones stimulés pour la mise en oeuvre de ce procédé | [1981/49] | Examination procedure | 09.03.1982 | Examination requested [1982/20] | 24.08.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 16.11.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.02.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 11.02.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.03.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2352662 [ ] (PIKTOR LTD); | FR2203622 [ ] (PIKTOR LTD [GB]); | DE2461379 [ ] (ANVAR); | FR2257306 [ ] (ANVAR [FR]) | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 67, Heft 15, 9. Oktober 1967, seite 6764, Zusammenfassung 71985u, Columbus, Ohio (US) R.M. FRIEDMAN et al.: "Stimulation of Interferon Production in Human Lymphocytes by Mitogens" & Proc. Soc. Exp. Biol. Med. 125 (3), 901-5 (1967) * ingesamt * | [ ] - Arch. Intern Med., Band 126, Juli 1970, Chigago (US) E. DE CLERCO et al.: "Induction of Interferon by Nonviral Agents, seiten 94-108 * seite 95, linke spalte, zeile 50 bis Mittele spalte, zeile 9; seite 97, rechte spalte, zeilen 38-48; seite 101: "Multiple Effects of Interferon...", bis seite 102, linke spalte, zeile 25 * | [ ] - The Journal of Immunology, Band 112 Heft 2, Februar 1974, Baltimore (US) L.B. EPSTEIN et al.: "Evaluation of T Lymphocyte Effector Function in Immunodeficiency Diseases: Abnormality in Mitogen-Stimulated Interferon in Patients with Selective IgA Deficiency" * seite 623: "Discussion" bis Ende der seite * | [ ] - Nature, Band 280, Heft 5724, August 1979, Basingstoke (US) J.M. ZARLING et al.: "Continuous Culture of T Cells Cytotoxix for Autologous Human Leukaemia Cells" seiten 685-688 * seiten 685, zeile 18 bis seite 686, linke spalte, zeile 3 * | [ ] - Nature, Band 283, Heft 5745, Januar 1980, Basingstoke (US) P. Newmark: "Engineering E. Coli Produce Interferon", seite 323 * ingesamt * |