EP0040860 - Dibenzoxazepine derivative, process for preparing the same and pharmaceutical composition comprising the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.01.1985 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.01.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.04.1985 [1985/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chugai Seiyaku Kabushiki Kaisha 5-1, 5-chome, Ukima Kita-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1981/48] | For all designated states Chugai Seiyaku Kabushiki Kaisha 5-1, 5-chome, Ukima Kita-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sasahara, Kazuo 4-61, Onari-cho Omiya-shi Saitama-ken / JP | 02 /
Honda, Masamitsu 5-3-9, Yokokawa Sumida-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Koizumi, Masuo 760, Mizumoto Iizukamachi Katsushika-ku Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Murakami, Yasushi 2-12-6, Shoan Suginami-ku Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Neichi, Tomohiro 2518-20, Oaza Tokorozawa Tokorozawa-shi Saitama-ken / JP | 06 /
Nakakimura, Hiroshi 4-13-14, Nishi-Kamakura Kamakura-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 07 /
Noda, Yukifumi 1-16-14-308, Meguro Meguro-ku Tokyo / JP | 08 /
Matsushita, Hiroshi 2-14-9, Nakane Meguro-ku Tokyo / JP | 09 /
Hata, shun-ichi 675-14, Nishitani-cho Hodogaya-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1981/48] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/48] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 81104100.3 | 27.05.1981 | [1981/48] | Priority number, date | JP19800070176 | 28.05.1980 Original published format: JP 7017680 | [1981/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0040860 | Date: | 02.12.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0040860 | Date: | 14.03.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.09.1981 | Classification | IPC: | C07D267/20, A61K31/55 | [1981/48] | CPC: |
C07D267/20 (EP,KR,US);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P3/08 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1981/48] | Title | German: | Dibenzoxazepin-Derivate, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und diese enthaltende pharmazeutische Zusammensetzungen | [1981/48] | English: | Dibenzoxazepine derivative, process for preparing the same and pharmaceutical composition comprising the same | [1981/48] | French: | Dérivés de dibenzoxazépine, procédé pour leur préparation, et compositions pharmaceutiques les contenant | [1981/48] | Examination procedure | 16.04.1982 | Examination requested [1982/36] | 03.12.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 09.03.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 24.08.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.11.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 25.11.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.12.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | EP0012385 [ ] (CHUGAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [JP]) | [ ] - Journal of Medicinal Chemistry, Vol. 21, No. 8, published in August 1978 Washington, US R.C. ALLEN et al.: "8-Carboxy-6-Sulfamyldibenz (B,F) (1,4) Oxazepines and - Thiazepines as Potential High-Ceiling diuretics", pages 838-40 * Compounds with formula 18-19; Experimental * |