EP0041671 - Substituted 3,3-dimethyl-butan-2-ones, process for their preparation and their use as intermediate products [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.09.1984 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/50] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Krämer, Wolfgang, Dr. Am Eckbusch 39/45 D-5600 Wuppertal 1 / DE | 02 /
Elbe, Hans-Ludwig, Dr. Dasnoeckel 59 D-5600 Wuppertal 11 / DE | [1981/50] | Application number, filing date | 81104158.1 | 01.06.1981 | [1981/50] | Priority number, date | DE19803021516 | 07.06.1980 Original published format: DE 3021516 | [1981/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0041671 | Date: | 16.12.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.1981 | Classification | IPC: | C07C49/175, C07C49/213, C07C49/233, C07C49/255, C07C119/042, C07C149/10, C07C149/30, C07C149/34, C07C147/06, C07C161/04, C07D233/58 | [1981/50] | CPC: |
C07D231/12 (EP,US);
A01N43/50 (EP,US);
A01N43/653 (EP,US);
C07C255/00 (EP,US);
C07C317/00 (EP,US);
C07C323/00 (EP,US);
C07C45/63 (EP,US);
C07C45/71 (EP,US);
C07C49/16 (EP,US);
C07C49/17 (EP,US);
C07C49/175 (EP,US);
C07C49/255 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C07C45/63, C07C49/16 (EP,US);
C07C45/63, C07C49/255 (US,EP);
C07C45/71, C07C49/175 (US,EP);
C07C45/71, C07C49/255 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1981/50] | Title | German: | 4-Substituierte 3,3-Dimethyl-butan-2-one, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung sowie ihre Verwendung als Zwischenprodukte | [1981/50] | English: | Substituted 3,3-dimethyl-butan-2-ones, process for their preparation and their use as intermediate products | [1981/50] | French: | 3,3-Diméthyl-butan-2-ones substituées, procédé pour leur préparation et leur utilisation à titre de produits intermédiaires | [1981/50] | File destroyed: | 14.07.1990 | Examination procedure | 01.06.1981 | Examination requested [1981/50] | 27.05.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.09.1984 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1984/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.06.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2635666 [ ] (BAYER AG) | [ ] - Journal of Organic Chemistry, Band 42, Nr. 10, 13. Mai 1977 Easton H.O. HOUSE et al. "Synthesis of omega-Bromo Ketones" seiten 1709 bis 1717 *seite 1710, formeln 1115* |