EP0041274 - Fluorescent composition having the ability to change wavelengths of light, shaped article of said composition as a light wavelength converting element, and device for converting optical energy to electrical energy using said element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.02.1985 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.04.1985 [1985/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEIJIN LIMITED 11 Minami Honmachi 1-chome Higashi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1981/49] | For all designated states TEIJIN LIMITED 11 Minami Honmachi 1-chome Higashi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Harada, Toshiaki Ozu Apartment No. 56 28-4, Ozu-cho 1-chome Iwakuni-shi Yamaguchi-ken / JP | 02 /
Hiramatsu, Toshiyuki Ozu Apartment No. 42 28-4, Ozu-cho 1-chome Iwakuni-shi Yamaguchi-ken / JP | 03 /
Yamaji, Teizo 5-10, Yamate-cho 4-chome Iwakuni-shi Yamaguchi-ken / JP | [1981/49] | Representative(s) | Diehl & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Erika-Mann-Straße 9 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/49] | DIEHL GLAESER HILTL & PARTNER Patentanwälte Postfach 19 03 65 D-80603 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 81104273.8 | 03.06.1981 | [1981/49] | Priority number, date | JP19800074180 | 04.06.1980 Original published format: JP 7418080 | JP19800095595 | 15.07.1980 Original published format: JP 9559580 | JP19800098633 | 21.07.1980 Original published format: JP 9863380 | [1981/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0041274 | Date: | 09.12.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0041274 | Date: | 14.03.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.09.1981 | Classification | IPC: | C09K11/06, C09K11/02, C08K5/00, H01L31/04 | [1981/49] | CPC: |
H01L31/055 (EP);
C09K11/06 (EP);
F21K2/00 (EP);
Y02E10/52 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1981/49] | Title | German: | Fluoreszierende Zusammensetzung mit der Fähigkeit die Wellenlängen des Lichtes zu verändern, Formkörper aus dieser Zusammensetzung als ein Lichtwellenlängen umwandelndes Element und Vorrichtung zur Umwandlung von optischer Energie in elektrische Energie unter Verwendung des genannten Elementes | [1981/49] | English: | Fluorescent composition having the ability to change wavelengths of light, shaped article of said composition as a light wavelength converting element, and device for converting optical energy to electrical energy using said element | [1981/49] | French: | Composition fluorescente permettant de changer les longueurs d'onde de la lumière, article moulé à partir de ladite composition comme élément transformant la longueur d'onde de la lumière, et dispositif pour transformer l'énergie optique en l'énergie électrique en utilisant ledit élément | [1981/49] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 30.10.1981 | Examination requested [1982/02] | 29.06.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.10.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 21.01.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 19.08.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.11.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 07.11.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.12.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.05.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US4088508 [ ]; | US4127499 [ ]; | US3886082 [ ] |