EP0042131 - Bank of electric key switches [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1981/51] | Electric key switch | ||
[1985/03] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.11.1985 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.01.1986 [1986/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dieter Grässlin Feinwerktechnik Postfach 103 D-7742 St. Georgen / DE | [1981/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kammerer, Gerd Schiltachweg 15 D-7742 St. Georgen / DE | [1981/51] | Representative(s) | Boecker, Joachim Hansmann & Vogeser Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grosse Eschenheimer Strasse 39 60313 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/51] | Boecker, Joachim, Dr.-Ing. Adelonstrasse 58 D-65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 81104409.8 | 09.06.1981 | [1981/51] | Priority number, date | DE19800016058U | 18.06.1980 Original published format: DE 8016058 U | [1981/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0042131 | Date: | 23.12.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0042131 | Date: | 16.01.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.1981 | Classification | IPC: | H01H3/12, H01H13/14, G05G1/02, H04M1/23 | [1981/51] | CPC: |
H01H13/70 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL [1981/51] | Title | German: | Elektrisches Tastenkontaktfeld | [1985/03] | English: | Bank of electric key switches | [1985/03] | French: | Panneau de bouton-poussoirs électriques | [1985/03] |
Former [1981/51] | Elektrischer Tastenkontakt | ||
Former [1981/51] | Electric key switch | ||
Former [1981/51] | Bouton-poussoir électrique | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 09.06.1982 | Examination requested [1982/33] | 28.06.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.12.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 29.06.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.09.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 27.09.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.10.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]AT356185B ; | DE1547539 [ ]; | [A]DE1190066 | [A] - O. RICHTER et al. "Bauelemente der Feinmechanik" 8. Auflage 1959,VEB VERLAG TECHNIK, Berlin Seiten 338, 339 |