EP0043914 - Delay switching device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.07.1984 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For:FR
GB
IT
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | For:AT
Siemens Bauelemente 0HG Siemensstrasse 43 8530 Deutschlandsberg / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1982/03] | For:FR
GB
IT
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | ||
For:AT
Siemens Bauelemente 0HG Siemensstrasse 43 A-8530 Deutschlandsberg / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jerney, Rudolf Jagdfeldring 81 D-8013 Haar / DE | 02 /
Kahr, Werner Czerwenyweg 3 A-8530 Deutschlandsberg / AT | [1982/03] | Application number, filing date | 81104473.4 | 10.06.1981 | [1982/03] | Priority number, date | DE19803029796 | 06.08.1980 Original published format: DE 3029796 | DE19803023407 | 23.06.1980 Original published format: DE 3023407 | [1982/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0043914 | Date: | 20.01.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0043914 | Date: | 09.06.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.1982 | Classification | IPC: | H01C7/02, H01C1/02, H04N9/29 | [1982/03] | CPC: |
H01C7/022 (EP);
H01C1/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, FR, GB, IT [1982/03] | Title | German: | Schalteinrichtung zum verzögerten Schalten eines Verbrauchers | [1982/03] | English: | Delay switching device | [1982/03] | French: | Dispositif de commutation temporisé | [1982/03] | File destroyed: | 14.07.1990 | Examination procedure | 28.10.1981 | Examination requested [1982/03] | 06.10.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.1984 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1984/38] | 22.03.1984 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1984/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US4164000 [ ]; | AT351611B [ ]; | FR2404332 [ ] |