Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] |
16.07.1984 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.09.1984 [1984/38] |
07.04.1982 | Publication of search report | published on 09.06.1982 [1982/23] |
20.11.1981 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 20.01.1982 [1982/03] |
20.11.1981 | Request for examination filed | published on 20.01.1982 [1982/03] |