Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3029796 | 25.02.1982 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3029796 | 06.08.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0043914 | Global Dossier | 09.06.1982 | A3 | EP0043914 | 20.01.1982 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE3029796 | 06.08.1980 | DE3023407 | 23.06.1980 |