EP0042585 - Semiconductor laser device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.07.1986 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.09.1986 [1986/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1981/52] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kuroda, Takao 4-815-2, Nishi-koigakubo Kokubunji-shi Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Umeda, Jun-ichi 612-10, Kamiichibu-katamachi Hachioji-shi Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Saito, Katsutoshi 2-19-14, Nangai Kigashiyamato-shi Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Kajimura, Takashi 2-32-A402, Koyasu-cho Hachioji-shi Tokyo / JP | [1981/52] | Representative(s) | Strehl, Peter, et al Patentanwälte Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/07] | Strehl, Peter, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Strehl Schübel-Hopf Groening u. Partner Postfach 22 14 55 D-80504 München / DE | ||
Former [1981/52] | Strehl, Peter, Dipl.-Ing. K.L. Schiff Dr. A. v. Funer Dipl.-Ing. P. Strehl Dr. U. Schübel-Hopf Dipl.-Ing. D. Ebbinghaus Dr.-Ing. D. Finck Patentanwälte Mariahilfplatz 2 & 3 D-8000 München 90 / DE | Application number, filing date | 81104655.6 | 16.06.1981 | [1981/52] | Priority number, date | JP19800082881 | 20.06.1980 Original published format: JP 8288180 | [1981/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0042585 | Date: | 30.12.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0042585 | Date: | 02.10.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.10.1981 | Classification | IPC: | H01S3/19 | [1981/52] | CPC: |
H01S5/20 (EP,US);
H01S5/2231 (EP,US);
H01S5/2059 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1981/52] | Title | German: | Halbleiter-Laservorrichtung | [1981/52] | English: | Semiconductor laser device | [1981/52] | French: | Dispositif laser à semiconducteur | [1981/52] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 15.10.1981 | Examination requested [1981/52] | 05.05.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 17.10.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.04.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 21.02.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.05.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 31.05.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.07.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | JP55124293 [ ]; | JP2000429380 [ ]; | US4011113 [ ] (THOMPSON GEORGE H B, et al); | USRE29395E [ ]; | US3920491 [ ] (YONEZU HIROO) | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Volume 4, No. 181, 13th December 1980 (E-37) (663) & JP - A - 55- 124293 (Matsushita) * Abstract *, & JP55124293 A 00000000 | [ ] - Electronics Letters, Volume 15, No. 4, February 1979 Hitelin Herts (GB) "Twin-Transverse-Junction Stripe Laser with Linear Light/Current Characteristic and Low Threshold" pages 133-134 * page 133, left-hand column * | Examination | US4121177 |